Financial history HC DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity number: 1127786
Charity reporting is overdue by 1698 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £9.40k £9.98k £8.98k £9.88k £14.44k
Total expenditure £9.28k £9.28k £8.79k £9.76k £11.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0