SCARBOROUGH SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Sigsworth | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Frances Dean Morrell | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Bright Lloyd | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Alder | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WEBSTER | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLWEN LUMSDEN | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY MASON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.73k | £4.45k | £24.14k | £28.43k | £32.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.16k | £84 | £23.93k | £20.41k | £16.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 20 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
The objects of the society shall be: 1. to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals; 2. to further such charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit but in particular through the making of grants and donations.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTISE NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Manor Gardens
Kirkbymoorside
YORK
YO62 6EX
- Phone:
- 07583 875330
- Email:
- thesecretarysso@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window