MY COMMUNITY SPACE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity provides a web site as a portal for Partners to offer their space-to-share and Users find meeting rooms and work areas. There are usually approximately a thousand spaces available nationally and approximately 10,000 views a month on average.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Llety/tai
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 07 Awst 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 02 Awst 2019: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- RELIEF AID LOGISTICS (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £780 | £57.37k | £7.27k | £64.30k | £240.17k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £818 | £57.23k | £7.08k | £55.34k | £292.35k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | 24 Ebrill 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | 24 Ebrill 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2016 | 28 Mehefin 2017 | 28 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2016 | 28 Mehefin 2017 | 28 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18/07/ 2008 AS AMENDED 01/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/05/2015 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE SUITABLE BUILDINGS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROVISION OF: A STANDBY WAREHOUSE AND TRANSHIPMENT FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, STORAGE, PROCESSING AND ONWARD DELIVERY OF RELIEF SUPPLIES BY RELIEF CHARITIES; B STANDBY WAREHOUSE AND TRANSHIPMENT FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, STORAGE, PROCESSING AND ONWARD DELIVERY OF THE DECEASED IN THE EVENT OF A DISASTER OR EMERGENCY IN ORDER TO PROTECT THE PUBLIC BY MINIMISING CONTAMINATION AND DISEASE; C STANDBY PREMISES, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO PROTECT THE PUBLIC IN THE EVENT OF A DISASTER OR EMERGENCY; D FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF PREMISES AND WORK SPACE FOR CHARITABLE USE E TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERING, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO OUTREACH AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PROSPECTIVE VOLUNTEERS TO CHOOSE A CHARITY TO VOLUNTEER FOR; (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS TO VOLUNTEER, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO COMMUNICATIONS, EXHIBITIONS AND PROMOTION EVENTS IN GENERAL HELPING CHARITIES CONVEY THE OPPORTUNITIES, COMMUNITY CONTRIBUTION AND BENEFITS OF VOLUNTEERING; (C) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WISHING TO RETURN TO WORK, STUDENTS AND THE RETIRED. SUBJECT TO SUCH CHARGES AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window