JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY

Charity number: 1132666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time Download