Financial history SOUTH WEST TYNESIDE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £297.32k £307.38k £308.67k £338.54k £654.32k
Total expenditure £281.83k £281.67k £320.10k £408.57k £432.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £621.94k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.38k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £391.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.85k