Trustees SOUTH WEST TYNESIDE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

56 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Varker Rev. Trustee 01 September 2020
STRATHMORE ROAD METHODIST CHURCH, ROWLANDS GILL
Received: On time
Karen Atkinson Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
Dr Mary Imlah Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
KAY ZWOLINSKA Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Alyson Moody Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
Rev David Charter Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Jean Crocker Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Susan Spencer Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Eunice Charlton Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
ANN GRAHAM Trustee 11 February 2018
None on record
DAVID THOMPSON Trustee 24 January 2018
THE SENORA TRUST
Received: On time
SHARON MACKIE Trustee 24 January 2018
None on record
ELIZABETH Anne PEART Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
CHRISTINE HEDLEY Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
PAMELA ANN SCOTT Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
FREDERICK JOHN BLUNDRED Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
ANGELA MARSHALL Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
ANN CRYER Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
HAZEL STRINGER Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
ISABELLA MACDONALD Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
MARGARET SHARP Trustee 06 January 2018
THE MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS RESEARCH AND RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
Rev MARTIN P JAMES Trustee 04 January 2018
None on record
MARION NELSON-WILLIAMS Trustee 30 September 2017
None on record
irene middlemass Trustee 30 September 2017
None on record
IAN ATKINSON Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
MARTIN ROUSE Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
Natalie Clark Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
BRENDA GRAHAM Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
ANN DIXON Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
STEPHEN LANCASTER Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
IRENE THOMPSON Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
NICHOLAS DICKINSON Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
MARGARET OLIVER Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
JOY CHAMBERS Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
Dr GRAEME OLIVER Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
PETER NELMES Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
ROGER LUCAS Trustee 13 September 2017
RYTON AND DISTRICT MUSICAL FESTIVAL COMMITTEE
Received: On time
SANDRA DIXON Trustee 13 September 2017
STRATHMORE ROAD METHODIST CHURCH, ROWLANDS GILL
Received: On time
Rev TREVOR CAPSTICK Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Rev Janet Capstick Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
TREVOR PEART Trustee 01 September 2016
RYTON AND DISTRICT MUSICAL FESTIVAL COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Trevor Peacock Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
REV BRIGITTA STEELE BA, BA, MA Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Rev Jenny Gill Trustee 02 September 2015
None on record
HEATHER MARY BOWES BED Trustee
None on record
SUSAN ROBSON LLB Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH ROSEMARY FORSTER EDWARDS BSC Trustee
None on record
MARY ELISABETH GRAY Trustee
None on record
VALERIE BURN Trustee
None on record
SHIRLEY BRADLEY Trustee
None on record
DAVID GRAY Trustee
None on record
GRAEME HERDMAN BSCHONS Trustee
None on record
LESLEY JUDITH FARNSWORTH Trustee
None on record
REV IAN NEIL COCKLING Trustee
None on record
JOSEPH SIMPSON Trustee
None on record
ARTHUR LEWIN Trustee
None on record