FRIENDS OF VALLEY GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Valley Gardens supports the curriculum and extra curricular activities for pupils of Valley Gardens Middle School. We do so by organising fund raising events and by running fun and educational activities for our pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 09 January 2009: Standard registration
- FOVG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amber Jobling | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.31k | £14.29k | £22.48k | £27.80k | £31.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.41k | £14.94k | £14.73k | £21.27k | £33.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 September 2020 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Valley Gardens Middle School
Valley Gardens
WHITLEY BAY
NE25 9AQ
- Phone:
- 0191 9176667
- Website:
-
Www.valleygardensmiddle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window