Financial history HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK

Charity number: 1127137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.02k £23.68k £16.06k £17.30k £7.43k
Total expenditure £16.23k £15.10k £17.76k £16.93k £12.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.00k N/A N/A N/A