Trustees HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK

Charity number: 1127137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Graham Homewood Chair 10 May 2014
None on record
Dr David Lewis Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Isabel Hodger Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Martin John Copland Trustee 27 May 2016
None on record
Lynn Elizabeth White Trustee 01 January 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORE
Received: On time
Christine Boulton-Lane Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Roger James MITCHELL MA Trustee
LOAF PROJECT
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORE
Received: On time
HASTINGS CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: 21 days late
ROBIN GRAY MA Trustee
None on record
DEREK TOMBLIN Trustee
None on record