CHARITY OF JOHN GORE
Charity number: 500058
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- North Yorkshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 21 April 1970: Standard registration
- 27 September 2004: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Other names:
- CHARITY OF JOHN GORE-TRUST NO 8463 (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT PPR 26 FEBRUARY 1894 AS AMENDED ON 4 NOVEMBER 1999 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF THE WESLEYAN METHODIST CHAPEL TOWN END, HELMSLEY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HELMSLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window