THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, NEW ALRESFORD, WINCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity. Promoting the whole mission of the church. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £420 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, NEW ALRESFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Wheeler | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Whale | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Scott-Morton | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noelle Nutman | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Waring Green | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Susan Teresa Ryton | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Greville Keyes Dawson | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Janet Mary Pooley | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Jeanette Page | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rex Bernard Corfield | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Parsons | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ann Skayman | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Geraldine Pinch | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Harrison Carr | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROSIE WARING GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Griffiths | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.13k | £203.92k | £217.63k | £183.45k | £181.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.34k | £204.53k | £191.27k | £185.69k | £184.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.61k | £2.19k | £1.00k | N/A | £420 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John the Baptist Church
West Street
Old Alresford
ALRESFORD
SO24 9AG
- Phone:
- 01962733545
- Email:
- arlevalleychurches@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window