Accounts and annual returns ALDERLEY EDGE AND KNUTSFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1127258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window