Trustees ALDERLEY EDGE AND KNUTSFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1127258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Povey Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Joan Mary Williams Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Roy William Bowers Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Rev Alan Raymond Bradley Trustee 01 September 2020
KNUTSFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Bryan Peak Trustee 22 April 2020
GAUNTLET CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
KNUTSFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MACCLESFIELD MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time
Pauline Glancy Trustee 22 April 2020
MOTTRAM ST ANDREW VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
William John Swires Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
Philip Bland Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
PETER RICHARDS Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Christopher Robertson Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
John McAllister Gracie Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Richard Jonathan Applewhite Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Julie Lee Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Ruth Deborah Peak Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Joyce Margaret Read Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Heather Christiansen Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
PETER GILBERT FREEMAN Trustee 01 September 2017
KNUTSFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr ANTHONY MICHAEL JUDD Trustee 01 September 2017
METHODIST CHURCH - MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT DISTRICT
Received: On time
Rev Susan Swires Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN EADIE Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Peter Ralph Thompson Trustee 01 January 2017
HOPE THROUGH ACTION
Received: On time
THE TATTON PARK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Elizabeth Hall Trustee 01 September 2014
THE ALLOSTOCK, LOWER PEOVER AND PLUMLEY AID FUND
Received: On time
Nigel John Aston Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Mr James Eaton Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Mr H Foster Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Jennifer Anne Bailey Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Carol Judith Fleming Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record
LYNDA MARIE MITCHELL Trustee 04 January 2013
None on record
STEVEN ATKINSON Trustee 21 March 2011
KNUTSFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
HENRY WATERS Trustee
KNUTSFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ERIC WALLWORK Trustee
THE ALDERLEY EDGE INSTITUTE TRUST
Received: On time