THE METHODIST CHURCH CUMBRIA DISTRICT (NO.9)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved. Taking religious assemblies in local schools. Promoting the whole mission of the church (& aiding social cohesion) through activities for older people, parents and toddlers & other specific need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK & overseas financially & with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
190 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Neal Tebbutt | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Alistair David Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Louise Roux | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Eleanor Rusling | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Derek Gregson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Leslie Hann | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Charles Newlove | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Lesley Dent | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE HASSON | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
GLYNIS IRENE HAYTON | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.79k | £245.11k | £254.65k | £266.76k | £305.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.97k | £188.39k | £156.25k | £209.83k | £268.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Valley Park
Whitehaven
CA28 8BA
- Phone:
- 01946590458
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window