Governing document CITIZENS ADVICE MID-NORTH YORKSHIRE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 2008 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAY 2018 as amended on 05 Apr 2019 as amended on 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN NORTH YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. AND ( B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE. AND IN THIS MEMORANDUM AND THE ARTICLES " CHARITABLE " DOES NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE THAT IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE " OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES " IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NORTH YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.