Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF ENGLISH CATHEDRALS

Charity number: 1128254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £181.70k £151.57k £478.61k £194.13k £196.11k
Total expenditure £74.91k £225.37k £194.93k £213.42k £291.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A