PENRITH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with other Methodist bodies,Churches Together in Penrith,local schools,hospitals.Outreach -ALPHA courses, work with children and young people on the Church premises and elsewhere,Luncheon Club for seniors,Conference Centre for outside groups,concert venue, charitable work in the UK and overseas, affirming the Christian faith through worship,service and outreach in and around Penrith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £7,675 from 5 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tim COOKE | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charles Frederick Thornton | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Louise Tebb-Roger | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel SMITH | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan GRAHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Anne MacDonald | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brunskill | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Graham John FROST BEd. MA | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael HULME | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dewayne BOONE | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morgan James Tebb-Roger | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Mx PJ Mulheron-Summers | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann COOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donald Clement AGUS BSc | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Anne Davidson | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
SHANE MCNICOL B.Eng | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Alison Catherine BIRKETT BEd Hons | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary WICKER BA | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chris SWIFT | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev GILLIAN BELFORD | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333.10k | £260.20k | £232.89k | £232.19k | £325.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.86k | £279.86k | £260.35k | £258.48k | £338.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £792 | £3.10k | £7.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penrith Methodist Church
Wordsworth Street
Penrith
CA11 7QY
- Phone:
- 01768 862787
- Email:
- ADMIN@PENRITHMETHODIST.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window