FLEET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular public acts of worship open to church members and non-members Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Pastoral work, including health, relationship and bereavement issues Providing clubs and activities with a Christian ethos, for all ages Supporting other charities and Christian organisations, financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £117,410 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Ann Bunch | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mutsa Ushewokunze | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jane Sawtell | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Reeves | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Jane Brewerton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ellen Hinton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Margaret Burrell | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Philip Oborski | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Nicholas Andrew Oborski | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
David Francis Burrell | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Bailey | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Hepworth Willmott | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Moore | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edith Ann Adams | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Janet Curley OBE | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dilanee Swerin Bunter | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Shepherd | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE CROSS | Trustee | 19 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE HOWARD RAGGETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN LAWRENCE SEXTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.20k | £234.91k | £235.50k | £262.24k | £284.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.66k | £226.87k | £212.63k | £296.76k | £277.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.89k | £117.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fleet Methodist Church
Reading Road South
FLEET
Hampshire
GU52 7TF
- Phone:
- 01252449750
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window