ST GILBERT'S PTA

Charity number: 1128751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 02 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required