Financial history THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CAMBRIDGE ST MARY THE GREAT WITH ST MICHAEL

Charity number: 1127668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £567.68k £717.84k £521.42k £1.07m £1.31m
Total expenditure £767.38k £753.57k £460.23k £871.83k £1.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.16k £71.27k £27.68k £1.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £262.03k £359.37k £302.77k £375.71k £193.67k
Income - Other trading activities £254.07k £298.43k £117.97k £627.11k £1.07m
Income - Charitable activities £22.62k £26.38k £4.04k £12.63k £8.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.96k £30.00k £25.95k £29.77k £34.73k
Income - Other £0 £3.66k £70.70k £29.17k £1.46k
Income - Legacies £2.00k £0 £10.01k £0 £8.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £673.88k £631.49k £388.26k £353.35k £388.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £91.43k £119.57k £69.81k £17.57k £13.40k
Expenditure - Governance £2.75k £3.76k £2.93k £5.19k £6.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £22.21k £25.73k £20.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £15.07k £5.97k £15.21k £10.50k
Expenditure - Other £2.07k £2.52k £2.16k £500.91k £763.54k