Trustees THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CAMBRIDGE ST MARY THE GREAT WITH ST MICHAEL
Charity number: 1127668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Stanley Allen Goodchild | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ware | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SMART | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
GORDON CAMPBELL | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LIZ ORME | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Goodwin Atwell | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIET JACKSON | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA WOMACK | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
ANDREW DOBSON | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID GRUMETT | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARION COBBY | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
AISHWARYA JACOB | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID BAGNALL | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev SHIRLEY HOLDER | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Selwyn Image | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Graham Day | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Day | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|||||
JOYE Elizabeth Rosenstiel | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Devin McLachlan | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET IRENE JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.