ALDERLEY EDGE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 500097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £33.01k £33.21k £28.44k £26.18k £3.29k
Total expenditure £32.44k £23.91k £21.10k £25.13k £3.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A