ALDERLEY EDGE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 500097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON LEES Trustee 09 November 2015 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN FERN Trustee None on record
EMILY STANLEY Trustee 27 May 2018 None on record
ALISON MARGARET WILKINSON Trustee 07 September 1970
EVANS ARTS TRUST Received: On time
MABEL EVANS TRUST Received: On time
THE ORCHARD TRUST Received: 14 days late
MARIA RUSHTON Trustee 20 January 2015 None on record
KEITH LOWE Chair 12 March 2005
THE BRITISH AND INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF FESTIVALS Received: On time
AMANDA BRABBAN-BROWN Trustee 16 November 2016 None on record
DEBORAH JONES Trustee 30 December 2013 None on record
Jennifer Lort-Limond Trustee 20 January 2021 None on record
JULIA TANNER Trustee 16 November 2016 None on record
SUSAN FREEMAN Trustee None on record
Lisa Campbell Trustee 20 January 2021 None on record
MARIE GRANT Trustee None on record