ROTARY CLUB OF STAMFORD ST MARTINS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1127500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 November 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 June 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 May 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required