ROTARY CLUB OF STAMFORD ST MARTINS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1127500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £8.66k £9.04k £8.04k £12.68k £6.00k
Total expenditure £9.86k £7.09k £8.53k £9.53k £16.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A