HUDSON FEN LEISURE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing Hudson's Fen for Sports and Community use We have installed a playpark for young children, with disabled access and equipment. Future projects will include more equipment for adults and children. We'd like to go on to build a Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 February 2009: Standard registration
- 11 November 2021: Funds received from 1063527 HUDSON FEN COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN KAVANAGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Roper | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neville Albert James Jackson | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shona Margaret Greig | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Barnicoat | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN GRIEF | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GILES | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ROPER | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £1.83k | £6.02k | £21.27k | £23.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £2.82k | £6.60k | £5.55k | £11.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
A SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GRIMSTON AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGE NEAR KING'S LYNN, NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 The Grove
Grimston
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE32 1DG
- Phone:
- 07774026528
- Email:
- shonagreig@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window