THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE'S, HATFIELD

Charity number: 1127942
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 December 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 December 2021 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 March 2021 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 March 2021 139 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time Download