THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, WESTBURY-ON-TRYM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Christian public worship open to all. The provision of a sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching the Christian faith and promoting the whole mission of the church. The provision of activities based on Christian values for children and young people including support for the local church school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,193 from 3 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WESTBURY-ON-TRYM PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDRE HENDRIK HART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clare Melody Waggett | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Marianne Jane Ailes | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Alison Burton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Joseph Turner | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Memery | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick John Harris | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Liddle | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bourne-Worster | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ailes | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Troughton | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL HOWSE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CANON DAVID ROBERT MCGREGOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH ROBERT YEANDEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £389.18k | £206.13k | £267.10k | £241.22k | £247.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.30k | £198.50k | £218.06k | £227.60k | £471.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTBURY ON TRYM PARISH OFFICE
CHURCH ROAD
WESTBURY-ON-TRYM
BRISTOL
BS9 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01179508644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window