Financial history EASTLEIGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127325
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022
Total gross income £272.85k £275.69k £363.31k £271.79k £436.66k
Total expenditure £298.91k £243.20k £272.79k £271.52k £425.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £18.37k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.86k