Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SOUTH HAYLING
Charity number: 1128975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR Jenny Gaffin | Chair | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Ruth Davies | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Doris Davies | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Clothier | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Mark Davies | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Griffiths | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOAD OBE | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SILVIA CRISTINA HAYWARD | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.