BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1138006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £126.39k £137.58k £928.48k £227.02k £462.28k
Total expenditure £127.70k £158.88k £189.66k £719.39k £579.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £68.86k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £61.71k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.02k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £796.88k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £189.66k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £250 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £4.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A