Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY, BRIDGWATER
Charity number: 1128525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Jane Osmond | Chair | 31 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen Richard Cross | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Cook | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Itziar Simo-Arroyo | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
THERESA CLARE STRANGE | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EDWARD STRANGE | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Percy Richard Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Lee | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Philpott | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Lloyd Hucker | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Nicholas Arthur Higgs | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIET MARION SULLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Carol Griffin | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.