RAYNES PARK KOREAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1128349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £130.36k £130.36k £127.09k £128.70k £117.71k
Total expenditure £132.73k £132.73k £113.67k £117.74k £119.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A