TAVISTOCK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £235.09k £218.87k £176.52k £211.37k £200.19k
Total expenditure £214.69k £214.19k £191.06k £192.14k £191.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.64k