TAVISTOCK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

36 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAN GOSLING Trustee 22 June 2015
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
JANET MARY SINGLETON Trustee None on record
REV DR Steven Emery-Wright Chair 01 September 2018 None on record
MRS PRIM SKEDGELL Trustee 23 June 2013
LAMERTON PARISH HALL Received: On time
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
JUSTIN COURTNEY JONES Trustee 22 June 2014 None on record
John Wright Trustee 05 July 2018
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
REV PHILIP GRIFFIN Trustee 01 September 2016
BUCKLAND AND HORRABRIDGE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
KELVIN JOHN SHILLABEER Trustee 22 June 2010 None on record
MR ROB PALMER Trustee
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Lorraine Jean Orton Trustee
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
MARY CLARKE Trustee None on record
MRS JACKIE WENDY PALMER Trustee
TAVISTOCK STREET PASTORS Received: On time
DEE BENZIE Trustee 28 February 2013 None on record
GEOFFREY CHARLES ORTON Trustee 17 July 2012
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (KNOWN AS TAVISTOCK COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND) Received: On time
JENNIFER ANNE PAGE Trustee 16 June 2016
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
IAN PARSONS Trustee 03 March 2016
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
MR DAVID NORMAN Trustee 17 July 2012 None on record
Nicholas John Clarke Trustee 20 June 2019 None on record
Margaret Smith Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
CAROLYN MARY BADGE Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN BIGGS Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
DR MARTIN ALAN WATTS Trustee 17 October 2013 None on record
FELICITY HELEN HAWKEN Trustee None on record
John Harris Trustee 16 June 2016
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
NEIL LESLIE TAMBLIN Trustee None on record
Sarah Biggs Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
MELANIE GRACE TAMBLIN Trustee
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Andrew Wing Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
Dr Ruth Helena Newman Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
NEIL JAMES WYLIE Trustee 17 July 2012 None on record
EUNICE WEEMYS Trustee 28 June 2015
TAVISTOCK STREET PASTORS Received: On time
Nathan Blundy Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
DR DAVID HUGH BENZIE Trustee 24 June 2012
TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
JACQUELINE SHILLABEER Trustee None on record
Margaret Irene Chambers Trustee 24 June 2021 None on record
PAM WYLIE Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record