THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, TURNHAM GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of church services and related activities in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,199,091
Donations and legacies | £939.96k | |
Charitable activities | £236.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.82k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£673,858
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £491.76k | |
Other | £182.10k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £182.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £491.76k | |
Retained for future use | £525.23k |
People

9 Employee(s)
23 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
- Lebanon
- Uganda
Governance
- 24 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF CHRIST CHURCH, TURNHAM GREEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NICOLA LOUISE MOY | Chair | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Ann Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Simon Garard Downham | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Oscar Fitzpatrick-Nash | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON HUNT KERTON-JOHNSON | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Robert Radcliffe Eastwood | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Celia Joan Bowring | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev James West | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Abraham Mendes da Costa | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Vonjy Rajakoba | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Roff | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Rea | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hamlyn | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Greg Kuzdenyl | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Rupert Cautley Holderness | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
NICOLA WENDY LOVELL | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ROBERT JARVIS | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JANET KATHLEEN TELLICK | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA FRANCES DENNISS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH ALISON CLARE NEWTON JONES | Trustee | 16 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Revd Richard John Moy | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD NICHOLAS PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JENNY MULLALY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £734.69k | £625.14k | £767.00k | £671.16k | £1.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £702.62k | £576.78k | £597.67k | £635.88k | £673.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £511.41k | £488.78k | £576.52k | £465.08k | £939.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £223.29k | £136.35k | £190.48k | £205.39k | £236.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1 | £0 | £0 | £689 | £22.82k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £503.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £702.26k | £576.78k | £597.67k | £635.88k | £491.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £360 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.30k | £4.60k | £4.80k | £4.65k | £5.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £55.55k | £72.99k | £62.19k | £44.62k | £62.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £182.10k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.09k | £8.44k | £111.09k | £82.79k | £55.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £307.00k | £332.41k | £424.15k | £488.94k | £1.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £44.40k | £19.80k | £44.85k | £46.06k | £79.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Turnham Green
Town Hall Avenue
LONDON
W4 5DT
- Phone:
- 02089957381
- Email:
- office@christchurchw4.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window