LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL, CHELTENHAM PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise various fund-raising events and activities, the proceeds from these provide the school with additional products and services that enhance our children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 May 2009: Standard registration
- LAKESIDE PTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Drakeley | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle Wilkinson | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jess Marston | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.34k | £36.52k | £6.22k | £13.48k | £12.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.06k | £33.48k | £6.41k | £13.18k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.16k | N/A | £8.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 September 2020 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1797 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL (FAO PTA)
HATHERLEY ROAD
CHELTENHAM
GL51 6HR
- Phone:
- 01242 524756
- Email:
- lakesidecheltpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window