Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ECCLESTON

Charity number: 1128365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SONYA JACQUELINE DORAGH Chair 04 May 2016
None on record
Alison Margaret Williams Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Anne Marie Quayle Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Ann Radice Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
HAZEL MARIANNE HEYWOOD Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Eric Michael Horton Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Jeff Rimmer Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Thomas Hurst Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Ruth Fiona Hurst Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Susan Brindley Trustee 19 March 2017
PRESCOT DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: 84 days late
Pauline Margaret Parr Trustee 10 April 2016
None on record
THOMAS PHILIP LARSEN Trustee 24 May 2013
None on record
HELEN MARGARET TWIST Trustee 15 May 2012
None on record
DAVID ALAN PARR CENG FIET Trustee
None on record
CHRIS HOYLE Trustee
None on record
DOROTHY PARTON Trustee
None on record