THE WOR HOOSE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wor Hoose is a resident led project and neighbourhood hub with a strong community focus. We aim to bring people together to learn new skills and access services through a 'one stop shop' to improve everyones life changes, overcome barriers to build stronger networks, a better community and overall improve their quality of life. Activities include hardship support, welfare advice and family time,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,355 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 12 February 2009: Standard registration
- WOR HOOSE (SWAT) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Mary Hellens | Chair | 05 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLYANN BLANEY | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlene Paterson | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOEY BLACKBURN | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.73k | £151.16k | £151.16k | £75.04k | £69.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.69k | £87.19k | £103.90k | £88.94k | £64.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.41k | £22.32k | £7.70k | £8.40k | £19.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TOTIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF EVERYONE LIVING IN WALKER, AND ESPECIALLY THOSE LIVING IN THE HEXHAM AVENUE HOUSING ESTATE.
Area of benefit
EVERYONE LIVING IN WALKER, AND ESPECIALLY THOSE LIVING IN THE HEXHAM AVENUE HOUSING ESTATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wor Hoose Community Project
31 - 33 Hexham Avenue
Walker
Newcastle upon Tyne
Tyne and Wear
NE6 3AL
- Phone:
- 01912872885
- Email:
- liz.worhoose@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window