Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHBURTON WITH BUCKLAND-IN-THE-MOOR AND BICKINGTON
Charity number: 1129094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Rylands | Chair | 31 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Joyce Arscott | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev John Seccombe Bennett | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Hext | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Lewis CA | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eve Nutley | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Wood | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Histed | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Geoffrey Axford | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Francis Anthony Parffrey | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
REV GEOFFREY ERIC CROSLAND FENTON | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DUNBALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL MARY TERESA WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM HENRY AMBROSE WEST | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE SOMERVILLE ASHTON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.