Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, HAYDON WICK
Charity number: 1128874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Southgate | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hosea Githi NJorge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Morton-Holmes | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Maureen Judge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William John Hunt | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jean Strowger | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ross Robertson | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Man Kai Kam | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Wiltshire | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Charmain Tan | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Hywel Bennett | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom Vandamme | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
RODRICK EWAN MCKAY MORTIMER TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON MORTIMER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.