Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW AND ST. MARY MAGDALENE, MAIDENHEAD

Charity number: 1127589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.92m £1.16m £963.31k £740.95k £760.12k
Total expenditure £2.45m £793.09k £794.19k £821.72k £812.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.85m £1.09m £859.53k £671.72k £704.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £37.83k £43.47k £48.16k £15.72k £19.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.42k £32.99k £51.72k £53.51k £36.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.90k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £300.00k £6.60k £10.00k £2.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £647.84k £750.02k £754.26k £812.65k £809.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.34k £1.14k £6.26k £2.16k £2.78k
Expenditure - Governance £6.20k £5.52k £4.47k £4.65k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £98.90k £14.03k £23.53k £46.83k £42.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £550 £460 £3.51k £1.48k £1.77k
Expenditure - Other £1.80m £41.94k £33.67k £6.90k £0