THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PETER FARNBOROUGH

Charity number: 1127534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S CHURCH FARNBOROUGH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Benjamin Paul Kendall Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Mandy Yuk Ying Burgess Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Matthew David Riley Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Virginia Winkworth Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Stephen Richard Moores Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Rowlandson Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Rev Timothy William Bateman Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Janet Susan Ruthven Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Leslie William Bolton Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
HELEN LOUISE COLE Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Yvonne Audrey Seagrave Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
David Shervington Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Jonathan James Coppock Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Jonathan Steven Kelly Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Rev Sarah Jane Norbron Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Catherine Helen Fewings Trustee 05 April 2017
None on record
Neil Eric Seagrave Trustee 29 April 2015
None on record
MARGARET TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
ANDREW LINN Trustee
None on record
DAVE ROWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £545.55k £562.89k £581.26k £513.18k £508.98k
Total expenditure £545.37k £517.36k £512.04k £576.98k £583.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £470.37k £530.49k £554.29k £464.67k £442.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £74.59k £20.97k £24.48k £46.60k £64.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £593 £166 £24 £510 £2.33k
Income - Other £0 £11.27k £2.46k £1.40k £0
Income - Legacies £20.01k £2.07k £80.82k £6.96k £100
Expenditure - Charitable activities £545.37k £517.36k £512.04k £576.98k £583.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.85k £5.70k £12.50k £2.92k £16.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £80.34k £77.23k £89.90k £80.41k £81.48k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.64m £1.68m £1.71m £1.75m £1.69m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £164.10k £215.06k £283.49k £207.56k £150.99k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £11.12k £13.84k £14.78k £12.19k £26.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Peters Parish Centre
60 Church Avenue
FARNBOROUGH
Hampshire
GU14 7AP
Phone:
01252513111