Trustees THE MUSTARD SEED PROJECT (KENYA)
Charity number: 1127935

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA FOWLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE RWAMBA NDWIGA | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA KARISA KADENGE | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Helen Mary Wilkins | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR Nicola Jayne Hinton | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Berry | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARCHANA GREGORY | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.