THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RIVERHEAD WITH DUNTON GREEN

Charity number: 1128522
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £109.84k £134.48k £88.22k £99.61k £102.79k
Total expenditure £115.60k £127.59k £97.04k £94.87k £85.88k