Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, RAINFORD

Charity number: 1127817
Charity reporting is up to date (136 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JANET ELIZABETH HEIGHTON Chair 19 January 2014
HENRY BISPHAM'S CHARITY
Overdue by 168 days
THE FRANK RICHARD PATRICK CHARITY
Overdue by 199 days
DANIEL ROSBOTHAM
Overdue by 168 days
CHARITY OF JAMES BASNETT
Overdue by 168 days
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Overdue by 168 days
OLD SCHOOL AND LYON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Overdue by 168 days
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Overdue by 168 days
THE BISPHAM CHARITIES
Received: On time
ORMSKIRK DEANERY MISSION GROUP
Received: On time
Janet Margaret Foster Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Anne Pamela Morris Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Susan Duerden Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Keith Gratton Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Sarah Jane Wright Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Dorothy Lorraine Wynne Trustee 22 May 2022
ORMSKIRK MOORGATE DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 76 days
Paul Michael Jones Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Rupert Henry Conquest Nichols Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
JUDITH MARGARET COLLINS Trustee 22 May 2022
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Overdue by 168 days
HENRY BISPHAM'S CHARITY
Overdue by 168 days
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Overdue by 168 days
DANIEL ROSBOTHAM
Overdue by 168 days
CHARITY OF JAMES BASNETT
Overdue by 168 days
THE FRANK RICHARD PATRICK CHARITY
Overdue by 199 days
OLD SCHOOL AND LYON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Overdue by 168 days
Pamela Anne Davenport Trustee 31 October 2020
CRANK NURSERY LIMITED
Received: On time
June Philippa Wisedale Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Anne Rosalind Harrington Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Janet Nancy Davies Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Diane Wesley Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
JUNE BURGESS Trustee
None on record
DAVID BURGESS Trustee
None on record