Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. FRANCIS, PETTS WOOD

Charity number: 1127654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Alex Niechcial Chair 19 April 2018
None on record
Rosina Parrington Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Pamela Thomas Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rosemary Hughes Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Theresa Hull Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
DAVID GERALD INCE Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
ANTHONY EDWARD BURLACE C.ENG Trustee
None on record
IRENE JONES Trustee
None on record
SUSAN CLARA BURLACE Trustee
None on record