THE WORCESTER/BIRMINGHAM AND DROITWICH CANALS SOCIETY

Charity number: 500159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.53k £15.29k £21.09k £26.11k £19.89k
Total expenditure £33.03k £17.38k £16.86k £24.29k £27.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A