DAGNALL STREET BAPTIST CHURCH ST ALBANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUNDAY SERVICES. COMMUNITY OUTREACH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Thompson | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Foster | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Pearce | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomi Odesola | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Movery-Peers | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Saunders | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ashmore | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paula Iddiols | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Oakley | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PENN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANIS MORSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.97k | £141.89k | £145.41k | £185.51k | £223.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.88k | £197.87k | £143.41k | £175.51k | £255.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2009 as amended on 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Cross Street
ST. ALBANS
AL3 5EE
- Phone:
- 01727 846891
- Email:
- church@dsbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window