THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EUSTACHIUS, TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1130516
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony John Cutler Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
NICHOLA JANE HEATHMAN Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Rev Judith Blowey Trustee 29 September 2018 None on record
CANON DR W J REA Trustee 29 June 2012 None on record
Catherine Mary Stoate Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
Fiona Ross Davidson Lang Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
VERY REVEREND DR CHRISTOPHER GEORGE HARDWICK Trustee 28 January 2015
NICHOLAS WATTS' GIFT Charity reporting is up to date
GRAHAM NEIL WHALLEY Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Peter Rowan Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
PAMELA JEAN HUNTER Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Scott Angell Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Rev Elizabeth Rose Illingworth Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Bastin Trustee 17 October 2020 None on record
Juliette Bowers Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Mary Whalley Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Patricia Iris Knock Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Ruth Julia Glanville Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
JAMES EDWIN TEAGUE Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record